U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02024
  • Case Name: Wells v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Remand]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
April, 2020
  • April 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.