U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00119
  • Case Name: Yousif v. Knaele et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • December 13, 2021: [USCA Order]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [USCA Order]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [USCA Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Reconsideration]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 12, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 07, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 05, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • April 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • February 12, 2021: [Stay]
  • February 11, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 09, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 15, 2021: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 28, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 08, 2020: [Sanctions]
  • July 07, 2020: [Sanctions]
June, 2020
  • June 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 16, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • June 05, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 03, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 03, 2020: [Reply]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 01, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • April 11, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.