U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00128
  • Case Name: Foley v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Sealed Document]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 20, 2020: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
  • July 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 14, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice - Other]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 23, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 13, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.