U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Barksdale v. Wells Fargo Card Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 08, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Order]
  • March 17, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • December 29, 2020: [Sealed Document]
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Order]
  • October 15, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 15, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • October 08, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 15, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 26, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 13, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 13, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.