U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01013
  • Case Name: Gonzales v Jensen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Continue Trial]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Withdraw]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 01, 2020: [Remand]
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.