U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00014
  • Case Name: Friesen et al v. Harvest International, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice - Other]
  • January 03, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [Leave to File]
  • January 03, 2023: [Compel]
  • January 03, 2023: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 21, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply]
  • October 07, 2022: [Errata]
  • October 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 27, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 27, 2022: [Leave]
  • September 16, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Sealed Document]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • June 14, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 13, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 06, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • May 13, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • April 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Substitute Party]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Substitute Party]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 08, 2021: [Statement]
  • November 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 07, 2021: [Suggestion of Death]
  • November 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 01, 2021: [Counterclaim]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 19, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • October 11, 2021: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • October 11, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Status Report]
November, 2020
  • November 13, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 16, 2020: [Notice of Consent]
  • October 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 12, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 23, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 26, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 25, 2020: [Status Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 04, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 22, 2020: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 22, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 01, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 29, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 07, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 07, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 07, 2020: [Counterclaim]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 16, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice to Attorneys/Pro Se Party (inter-district transfer in)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 16, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.