U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00038
  • Case Name: Kennedy v. CRST Expedited Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [In Limine]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2021: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Compel]
December, 2020
  • December 04, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 12, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.