U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00133
  • Case Name: Spengler v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • December 08, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Objections - Generic]
September, 2020
  • September 15, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 14, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • August 03, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 09, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 08, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 04, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 03, 2020: [Brief /Other]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 17, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 17, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.