U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02033
  • Case Name: LK Waterloo, LLC v. Waterloo, City of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • September 21, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 17, 2020: [Sanctions]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Sanctions]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Seal Document]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Compel]
  • April 29, 2020: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.