U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00136
  • Case Name: Clervrain v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • April 24, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • April 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.