U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Fredrickson v. McAuliffe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • June 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Reconsideration]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • December 11, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • December 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
November, 2020
  • November 18, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 12, 2020: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • May 11, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.