U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00135
  • Case Name: Fontanez v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • July 15, 2020: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 10, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • May 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 26, 2020: [Seal]
  • May 21, 2020: [Letter]
  • May 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • May 13, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Leave]
  • May 08, 2020: [Certification of Inmate Account]
  • May 04, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 25, 2020: [Order]
  • April 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2020: [Seal]
  • April 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 21, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.