U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00041
  • Case Name: Haggard v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 09, 2020: [Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 09, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 23, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.