U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Clayborn v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Case Ready for Decision]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: [Seal Document]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.