U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Hill v. Boone County, Iowa et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 24, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
February, 2021
  • February 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • February 03, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order]
  • November 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 03, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 17, 2020: [Errata]
  • August 13, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • May 28, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 28, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • April 28, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.