U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02027
  • Case Name: Nathem v. Nathem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Remand to State Court]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.