U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00140
  • Case Name: Howell v. Iowa PBS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [Notice - Other]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [Order]
  • September 01, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 01, 2020: [Notice - Other]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 18, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order]
  • May 22, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 22, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • May 06, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 29, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.