U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Eis v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 19, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [USCA Order]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • June 26, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 25, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • June 04, 2020: [Reconsideration]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 26, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.