U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00141
  • Case Name: Sanders v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 12, 2020: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • May 15, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 13, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 02, 2020: [Order]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.