U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Hewitt v. Lyons et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • July 19, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 18, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • July 05, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Reply]
  • July 06, 2021: [Letter]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • June 25, 2021: [Reply]
  • June 24, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 23, 2021: [Seal]
  • June 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 14, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
March, 2021
  • March 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Status Conference]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order]
  • September 30, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 29, 2020: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order]
  • August 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 27, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Continue]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Continue]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.