U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Fennell v. Van Houten et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • August 09, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • June 15, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • June 15, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • April 15, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 22, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 09, 2021: [Mail Returned]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 19, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
  • August 11, 2020: [Hearing/Oral Argument]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Change of Address]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • June 15, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 26, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 08, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 07, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.