U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00144
  • Case Name: Tokpa v. Discover Financial Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 12, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 12, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Stay]
  • August 14, 2020: [Stay]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 10, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 25, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • June 12, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 27, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • May 19, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • May 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 07, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.