U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00045
  • Case Name: GREEN v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
  • November 12, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 12, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
December, 2020
  • December 07, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 21, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • September 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2020
  • May 11, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.