U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Pruitt v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
  • March 01, 2021: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • November 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 11, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 11, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 11, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 11, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.