U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00121
  • Case Name: B. et al v. Johnston Community School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Trial Brief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Brief /Other]
March, 2021
  • March 12, 2021: [Trial Brief]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 02, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • February 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 10, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 07, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 04, 2020: [Sealed Document]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • July 06, 2020: [Waiver of Service Executed]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Seal Document]
  • May 12, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.