U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Overton v. Wheeler et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • July 19, 2022: [Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice - Other]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 04, 2022: [Reply]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sealed Document]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • February 23, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 17, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • January 27, 2022: [Reply]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice - Other]
  • January 24, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 16, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 23, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 23, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [Errata]
  • August 06, 2021: [Reply]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 28, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 23, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • May 07, 2021: [Letter]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • April 09, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 09, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 08, 2021: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 05, 2021: [Notice - Other]
  • April 02, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 24, 2021: [Compel]
  • March 24, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • March 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 19, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • March 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 09, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • March 09, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 08, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • March 02, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 02, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • March 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • February 05, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 02, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • February 02, 2021: [Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 14, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 11, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • December 14, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2020: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 18, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2020: [Leave]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • August 25, 2020: [Order]
  • August 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 14, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 27, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 23, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 01, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 13, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 12, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.