U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00149
  • Case Name: Verbio North America Corporation v. Weston and Associates, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • March 11, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 09, 2021: [Status Report Order]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Declaration]
  • November 06, 2020: [Leave to File]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Compel]
  • October 16, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 10, 2020: [Reply]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 15, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 12, 2020: [Compel]
  • May 12, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 12, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.