U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00151
  • Case Name: Luana Savings Bank v. Federal Home Loan Bank of Des Moines
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 28, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • May 27, 2020: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 18, 2020: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 15, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 15, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 14, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.