U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00042
  • Case Name: Kearns et al v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • July 01, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Judgment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • June 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2020: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.