U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Palmer Holdings and Investments, Inc. v. Integrity Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 02, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [USCA Order]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [USCA Order]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • January 08, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 06, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • January 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 07, 2020: [Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 16, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 03, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 23, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • October 16, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
  • October 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • October 02, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • October 02, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 14, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 11, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • September 11, 2020: [Leave]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • August 13, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 01, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 21, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • May 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 19, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • May 18, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 15, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.