U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00157
  • Case Name: Saulmon v. QPS Employment Group, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 13, 2020: [Dismiss]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 18, 2020: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • May 18, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.