U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00156
  • Case Name: Kirk v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • January 21, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • September 29, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 28, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • September 25, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • September 24, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order]
  • August 13, 2020: [Evidentiary Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Affidavit]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 28, 2020: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
  • May 27, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 18, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.