U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00160
  • Case Name: Curtis v. Iowa District Court for Adams County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 30, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Order]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • April 20, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 23, 2021: [Appeal Remark]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • February 25, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 23, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 05, 2020: [Reconsideration]
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2020: [Writ]
  • October 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 06, 2020: [Writ]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [Brief /Other]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 22, 2020: [Dismiss]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.