U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00046
  • Case Name: Harlock v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • May 20, 2021: [Remand to Agency]
  • May 11, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
January, 2021
  • January 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Social Security Briefing Schedule Order]
  • December 31, 2020: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • December 31, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 18, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 22, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 21, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 21, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.