U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04026
  • Case Name: Commstock Investments, Inc v. Sebade et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Stay]
  • December 16, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • November 02, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 10, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • July 07, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.