U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Olguin Valles vs. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 06, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to Answer]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 13, 2021: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • April 12, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 26, 2020: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.