U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00166
  • Case Name: Clinton v. Garrett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 09, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Strike]
  • July 30, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 30, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Errata]
  • May 12, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Errata]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 26, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 23, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • April 23, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 23, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • April 23, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 23, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • April 09, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 01, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • April 01, 2021: [Sealed Document]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 31, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 31, 2021: [Leave]
  • March 31, 2021: [Seal]
  • March 30, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • March 26, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • March 26, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 26, 2021: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • March 26, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • March 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2020: [Leave to File]
  • December 02, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • December 02, 2020: [Leave]
November, 2020
  • November 27, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 06, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order]
  • July 08, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • July 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 26, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 15, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 12, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.