U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00168
  • Case Name: Stringer v. Collier et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • November 04, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 04, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 05, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 01, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.