U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00171
  • Case Name: Hill v. Bank America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 15, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2021
  • January 06, 2021: [USCA Order]
December, 2020
  • December 02, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • November 12, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 01, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
  • September 17, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • September 17, 2020: [Stay]
  • September 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2020: [Stay]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reconsideration]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Judgment]
  • August 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • August 20, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 03, 2020: [Stay]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 28, 2020: [Stay]
  • July 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 24, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 20, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 20, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 07, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 06, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 06, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 01, 2020: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 01, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.