U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00169
  • Case Name: Nutriquest, LLC v. Heckman Management Corp, et al.,
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 02, 2021: [Stipulation]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 12, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
February, 2021
  • February 15, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 21, 2021: [Leave to File]
  • January 21, 2021: [Leave]
  • January 19, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 15, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 25, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 24, 2020: [Quash]
  • November 24, 2020: [Status Report]
  • November 19, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2020: [Quash]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • October 16, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Affidavit]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 16, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 09, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 04, 2020: [Jury Demand]
  • September 01, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • August 18, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 17, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 17, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 07, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 04, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • July 24, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • July 23, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 23, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 10, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • June 26, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • June 26, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • June 01, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 01, 2020: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • June 01, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.