U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02036
  • Case Name: Kelly et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Recusal]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2020: [Strike]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 10, 2020: [Strike]
  • June 03, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.