U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00172
  • Case Name: Inman v. Weitzell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 06, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 02, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 15, 2020: [Order]
  • December 14, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 14, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order]
  • October 26, 2020: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • October 23, 2020: [Letter]
  • October 14, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 13, 2020: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Initial Review Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 03, 2020: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.