U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00173
  • Case Name: Rohlf v. CNA Financial Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 16, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • July 16, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 08, 2020: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 29, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 12, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 04, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 03, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.