U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-04030
  • Case Name: Sioux City Foundry Company v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 05, 2021: [Compel]
  • February 05, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • February 05, 2021: [Sanctions]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • December 28, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2020: [Protective Order]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2020
  • September 17, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 05, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.