U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00176
  • Case Name: RFID Technology Innovations, LLC v. Real Asset Management, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • August 04, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 03, 2020: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 14, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 09, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 08, 2020: [Report Regarding Patent & Trademark]
  • June 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 05, 2020: [Statement]
  • June 05, 2020: [Copyright/Patent/Trademark Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.