U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00175
  • Case Name: King et al v. Skinner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice - Other]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice - Other]
  • January 03, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Reply]
  • December 19, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 07, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [File Overlength Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2022: [Errata]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Status Report]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2022: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 18, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • July 05, 2022: [Errata]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Status Report]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 22, 2022: [Status Report]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Brief /Other]
  • January 05, 2022: [Brief /Other]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • December 01, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Scheduling Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 29, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2021: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • April 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 13, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2020: [Objections - Generic]
  • August 05, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 22, 2020: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • July 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.