U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Grimes v. U.S. Department of Education et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Judgment - Consent]
  • February 03, 2021: [Stipulation]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Closing Documents]
November, 2020
  • November 05, 2020: [Notice of Settlement]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Stay]
  • September 25, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 24, 2020: [Redacted Document]
  • September 24, 2020: [Joinder]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • August 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 25, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 25, 2020: [Stay]
  • August 25, 2020: [Declaration]
  • August 25, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • August 25, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order]
  • August 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 17, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 07, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 06, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 10, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 10, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • July 10, 2020: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 10, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • July 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 05, 2020: [Summons Issued]
  • June 05, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.