U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cv-00178
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Five Firearms Seized from 214 N.W. Sharmin Drive, Ankeny, Iowa
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Default Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Default Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
February, 2021
  • February 03, 2021: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • February 02, 2021: [Default Entry by Clerk]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Writ Returned]
  • October 19, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice - Other]
June, 2020
  • June 11, 2020: [Writ Issued]
  • June 10, 2020: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • June 08, 2020: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.