U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cv-01011
  • Case Name: Brownmed, Inc v. Medline Industries, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 18, 2020: [Dismiss]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Stay]
  • November 04, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Strike]
  • October 13, 2020: [Protective Order]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 17, 2020: [Extension of Time]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 09, 2020: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.