U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cv-00052
  • Case Name: Rice et al v. Walmart Stores, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 01, 2021: [Errata]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
  • November 03, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • November 03, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • October 20, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 13, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 26, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • February 23, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2021: [Order]
  • February 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 18, 2021: [Status Report]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2021: [Protective Order]
December, 2020
  • December 10, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • December 09, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Order]
  • November 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 18, 2020: [Status Report]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 21, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 18, 2020: [Order]
  • September 14, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 11, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 20, 2020: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.